Kelkar, Kumar Vishnoo (CPSO#: 47345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:B. J. Medical College, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
185 Plains Road
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Phone: (905) 631-9355
Fax: (905) 631-1400
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUMAR VISHNOO KELKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELKAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1963 to 30 Jun 1964
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1965 to 30 Jun 1966
Other - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1998