Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kell, John Sholds (CPSO#: 66863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 421-4499
Fax: (416) 421-4466
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. John S. Kell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kell ( CPSO# 66863 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6552

Business Address:
Suite 302
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 421-4499

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SHOLDS KELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998