Kellar, Robert Harvey (CPSO#: 22914)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 1979
Summary:

 In September 1979, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kellar guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he charged a fee for services not 
 performed, contrary to s. 26(14); in that he falsified a record in respect of the examination or 
 treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 26(15); in that he knowingly submitted a false or 
 misleading account or false or misleading charges for services rendered to a patient, contrary to 
 s. 26(16); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that 
 Dr. Kellar be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that 
 his licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Jun 1979
Hearing Date(s): 09 Jan 1978