Keller, Emilia (CPSO#: 56680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Komenskeho, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Keller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2013

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Allegations that Dr. Emilia Keller committed professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, namely that she (i) failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and (ii) engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. In the face of these allegations, and without the allegations having been adjudicated, Dr. Keller resigned from the College, effective May 1, 2013, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.