Keller, John Robert (CPSO#: 59880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1033 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Phone: (416) 515-0007
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Keller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keller ( CPSO# 59880 )

Business Address:
303 - 1033 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 515-0007

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT KELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989