Kellett, John Gale (CPSO#: 54905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Kiln Ballinaclough Nenagh County Tipperary Ireland E45 Y722
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016