Kellett, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 65329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Names: Bujouves, Lisa Marie (used until: 19 May 1998 )     Kellett, Lisa Marie (used until: 01 Aug 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
108 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2H3
Phone: (416) 440-2597
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE KELLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993