Kelley, Catherine Lois (CPSO#: 55322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: Ryan, Catherine Lois (used until: 09 Dec 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Don Valley Medical Associates Inc.
Fairview Family Health Organization
Suite 144
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 491-5900
Fax: (416) 491-1149
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LOIS KELLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987