Kelley, Simon Paul (CPSO#: 89560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room S107 Elm Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6435
Fax: (416) 813-6414
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon P. Kelley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kelley ( CPSO# 89560 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room S107 Elm Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6435

Business Address:
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation
Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 425-6220

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Simon Paul Kelley may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Kelley  holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr. Kelley no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.