Kellner, Barbara Lynn (CPSO#: 66316)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997