Kelly, Daniel Michael (CPSO#: 86863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1617 Baker St
Suite 13
Cranbrook BC  V1C 7A3
Phone: 778 517 5858
Fax: 778 517 5818
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kelly ( CPSO# 86863 )

Business Address:
13 - 1617 Baker Street
Cranbrook BC  V1C 1B4
Phone Number: (778) 517-5858

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins & District Hospital 700 Ross Avenue East Timmins ON P4N 8P2 Phone: 705-267-2131
Date Received: 09 Jan 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MICHAEL KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012