Kelly, Douglas Albert (CPSO#: 63628)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 29 May 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2015