Kelly, Edmond Norman Mary (CPSO#: 54655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Room 19-231C
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5310
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Neonatology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly ( CPSO# 54655 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Room 19-231C
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDMOND NORMAN MARY KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1986