Kelly, Erin Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 88674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Gastroenterology
Box 255 Room
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73002
Fax: 613-737-8296
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kelly ( CPSO# 88674 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department fo Gastroenterology
Box 255, Room W1207 Main Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MARGARET MARY KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012