Kelly, Francis Bernard (CPSO#: 26963)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2012