Kelly, James Edward (CPSO#: 60941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
3501 W E Knight Drive
Fort Smith AR  72903
United States
Phone: (479) 709-8300
Fax: (479) 709-8315

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1990