Kelly, Kate Maureen (CPSO#: 95184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Clinic
343 Preston St
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kate Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kelly ( CPSO# 95184 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Clinic
343 Preston Street
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE MAUREEN KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016