Kelly, Leonard Francis Joseph (CPSO#: 59448)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Dec 2014

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 24, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kelly was referred to the Discipline Committee by way of Notice of Hearing on May 17, 2005, on allegations that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by being in possession of electronic images of child pornography. Effective December 24, 2014, Dr. Kelly has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Kelly does not admit the allegations and does not admit any fault or liability. Given Dr. Kelly’s resignation and undertaking not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.