Kelly, Maeve Catherine (CPSO#: 56391)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988