Kelly, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 31024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Freeport Site
3570 King St E
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1979