Kelly, Ryan Patrick (CPSO#: 105496)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Program Director of MIS Fellowship Dr. Tim Jackson 399 Bathurst Street Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2015 to 10 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2015 to 31 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017