Kelly, Sheila Mary (CPSO#: 23511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 carling ave
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 4081072
Fax: (613) 7614506
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
Department of Radiology
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 7378571
Fax: (613) 761-4506
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
Department of Radiology
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 7378571
Fax: (613) 761-4506
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kelly ( CPSO# 23511 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA MARY KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1971