Kelly, Wayne John (CPSO#: 57396)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994