Kelsall, Diane Lynn (CPSO#: 56792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1031 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 3W7
Phone: 866-971-9171 Ext. 8447
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE LYNN KELSALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELSALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 28 Feb 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988