Kelton, Gaylen Michael (CPSO#: 32459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Indiana University Methodist FPC
1520 North Senate Avenue
Indianapolis IN  46202-2213
United States
Phone: (317) 984-9584
Fax: (317) 962-6722

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYLEN MICHAEL KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981