Kelton, John Greenhow (CPSO#: 27626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC-3H50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 20524
Fax: (905) 524-2983
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John G. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kelton ( CPSO# 27626 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3H52
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GREENHOW KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1978