Kelton, Timothy Jon (CPSO#: 62204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Complete
Traveler's Clinic
Suite 410
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 293-4905
Fax: (416) 321-3848
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
Emergency Department
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2550 Ext. 0
Fax: (416) 495-2551
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kelton ( CPSO# 62204 )
Dr. Y. Kelton ( CPSO# 76511 )

Business Address:
The Complete and Healthy Traveler's Clinic
410 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-4905

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
Emergency Department
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
Units 6 & 7
2 Bloomfield Trail
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 2H8
Phone Number: (905) 313-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JON KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991