Kelton, Yasmine Silvia (CPSO#: 76511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: Rizwan, Yasmine Silvia (used until: 25 Jan 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6 & 7
2 Bloomfield Trail
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 2H8
Phone: (905) 313-8000
Fax: (905) 313-8001
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Kelton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kelton ( CPSO# 62204 )
Dr. Y. Kelton ( CPSO# 76511 )

Business Address:
Units 6 & 7
2 Bloomfield Trail
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 2H8
Phone Number: (905) 313-8000

Business Address:
The Complete and Healthy Traveler's Clinic
410 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-4905

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace Hospital
Emergency Department
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMINE SILVIA KELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003