Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Male
Languages Spoken: English
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
As from 4:00 p.m., December 11, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kelvin Wing-Ming Leung: Practice Restriction (i) Dr. Leung shall not perform hemorrhoid procedures. Posting a Sign (Practice Restriction) (ii) Dr. Leung shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Leung must not perform hemorrhoid procedures. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca". (iii) Dr. Leung shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides services, of the sign described above in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." (iv) Dr. Leung shall provide the certified translation(s) to the College within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (v) If Dr. Leung elects, after the date of this Order, to provide services in any other language(s), he will notify the College prior to providing any such services. (vi) Dr. Leung shall provide to the College the certified translation(s) prior to beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in (v) above. Monitoring (vii) Dr. Leung shall inform the College of each and every location that he practises or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location. (viii)Dr. Leung shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Leung's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions; (ix) Dr. Leung shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Leung's compliance with the terms of this Order; (x) Dr. Leung shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practises or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.
Committee: Discipline Decision Date: 11 Dec 2017 Summary:
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF) Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: December 11, 2017
Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department Active Date: September 20, 2017 Expiry Date: Summary: Effective February 24, 2020, Dr. Leung has completed all elements of this SCERP.Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP: Download Full Document (PDF)