Kendal, Wayne Stan (CPSO#: 58530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE STAN KENDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987