Kendall, Hugh Edward Allan (CPSO#: 62303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Endosurgery Centre
Suite B03
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 426-2028
Fax: (905) 426-2033
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Kendall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kendall ( CPSO# 62303 )

Business Address:
B03 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2028

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH EDWARD ALLAN KENDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENDALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1992