Kendall, Perry Robert William (CPSO#: 41802)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1999