Kendrick, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 20676)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000