Kendzerska, Tetyana (CPSO#: 104205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2017

Expiry Date:  29 Feb 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ICES/SRI
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-4758
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 01 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Feb 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tetyana Kendzerska may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Respirology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which  Dr.
                        Kendzerska  holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Kendzerska no longer holds  the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Kendzerska's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee   makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Kendzerska's
                        certificate  of  registration,   following   consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  March  1,  2017.   In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 29, 2024.