Kennedy, Alexander John (CPSO#: 18433)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014