Kennedy, Alphonsus Liquori (CPSO#: 25288)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998