Kennedy, David Scott (CPSO#: 30857)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2012