Kennedy, Erin Diane (CPSO#: 69124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital, Suite 449
4th floor
Division of General Surgery
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6872
Fax: (416) 586-8644
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kennedy ( CPSO# 69124 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
4th Floor Suite 455
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN DIANE KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004