Kennedy, James Allan Mark (CPSO#: 93149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Hematology
OPG Building, 700 University Avenue
7th floor 7W307
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALLAN MARK KENNEDY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KENNEDY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KENNEDY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KENNEDY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KENNEDY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KENNEDY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KENNEDY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018