Kennedy, James Francis (CPSO#: 110662)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 23 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017