Kennedy, Kerry Bunting (CPSO#: 27855)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Feb 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017