Kennedy, Michael Gerald (CPSO#: 30671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 Union Street
Natick MA  01760
United States
Phone: (508) 655-5115
Fax: (508) 650-9351

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERALD KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985