Kennedy, Renee Shannon (CPSO#: 59830)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2000