Kennie, Robin Campbell (CPSO#: 73461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2J9
Phone: (613) 264-2686
Fax: (613) 264-0454
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Kennie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kennie ( CPSO# 73461 )

Business Address:
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2J9
Phone Number: (613) 264-2686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN CAMPBELL KENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001