Kenny, William Francis (CPSO#: 96869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University Student Health
Psy Counselling & Disability Serv
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2508
Fax: (613) 533-2347
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
             Dr. William Francis Kenny may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
                                                 only.