Kent, Jerrod Singh (CPSO#: 86964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 14
233 Brady Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 4H5
Phone: (705) 626-3030
Fax: (705) 674-9169
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerrod S. Kent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kent ( CPSO# 86964 )

Business Address:
Suite 14
233 Brady Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 4H5
Phone Number: (705) 675-1115

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERROD SINGH KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012