Kent, Kimberley June (CPSO#: 86786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: 905-607-0921
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: 905-813-3850
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY JUNE KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009