Kent, Lenore Julia (CPSO#: 56974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: Hillen, Lenore Julia (used until: 01 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Nishikawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nishikawa ( CPSO# 51280 )
Dr. L. Kent ( CPSO# 56974 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-1557

Business Address:
412 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-5164

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-6737

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LENORE JULIA KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1988