Kent, Nancy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 42647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: C/O The Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine BC Women's Hospital 4500 Oak Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 3N1
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013