Kentab, Osama Yousef Yacoub (CPSO#: 69426)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 24 Oct 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 24 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Oct 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999